Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949645

EP0949645 - Auxiliary contact device for magnetothermal circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Sace S.p.A.
Via Vittor Pisani, 16
20124 Milano / IT
[2005/06]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
ABB Elettrocondutture S.p.A.
Via Dell'Industria, 18
20010 Vittuone (Mi) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Jacovino, Elio
Via Iseo 13
20052 Monza (Mi) / IT
02 / Redaelli, Claudio
Via Corridoni 3
20063 Seveso (Mi) / IT
[1999/41]
Representative(s)Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A.
Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
ZANOLI & GIAVARINI S.r.l. Viale Bianca Maria, 35
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/35]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
GIAVARINI E ASSOCIATI S.R.L. Via XX Settembre, 58/A
24122 Bergamo / IT
Former [1999/41]Giavarini, Francesco
ABB Ricerca S.p.A. Viale Edison, 50
20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT
Application number, filing date99200905.024.03.1999
[1999/41]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0060524.03.1998         Original published format: IT MI980605
[1999/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0949645
Date:13.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0949645
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0949645
Date:19.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H71/46, H01H71/04
[1999/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/01]
Former [1999/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hilfskontakteinrichtung für magnetothermische Schutzschalter[1999/41]
English:Auxiliary contact device for magnetothermal circuit breaker[1999/41]
French:Dispositif de contacts auxiliaires pour disjoncteur magnéto-thermique[1999/41]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
27.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
07.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2004Fee for grant paid
15.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2005
BE19.01.2005
CH19.01.2005
LI19.01.2005
NL19.01.2005
ES30.04.2005
[2006/22]
Former [2006/12]AT19.01.2005
BE19.01.2005
CH19.01.2005
LI19.01.2005
ES30.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT19.01.2005
BE19.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0394144  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [X] 1,4-8 * column 3, line 2 - column 5, line 43 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 28 * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 9-14;
 [Y]FR2647951  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [Y] 9-13 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-4 *;
 [YA]EP0326446  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [Y] 14 * the whole document * [A] 1-13,15,16;
 [A]WO9628836  (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AG OESTER [AT]) [A] 2,3 * page 3, line 31 - line 40 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 1; figures 2,6 *