Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0955596

EP0955596 - Customer access solutions architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CITIBANK, N.A.
399 Park Avenue New York
New York 10043 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
CITIBANK, N.A.
399 Park Avenue
New York, New York 10043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brown, R.Kenneht
142 The Crescent
Babylon, NY 17702 / US
02 / D'onofrio, John
83 Highland Road
Staten Island, NY 10308 / US
03 / Ellerbee, James
94 Jolen Drive
Hillsdale, NY 07642 / US
04 / Gould, Jay
21 Pitchpine Place
Medford, NY 11763 / US
05 / Holme, Jennifer
110 East 87th St.
Apt. 3C, New york, NY 10128 / US
06 / Lupario, J.peter
18 Austin Drive
Easton, CT 06612 / US
07 / Marthi, Umesh
7 Colgate Street
Apt 1, Jersey City, NY 07302 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [1999/45]01 / Brown, R.Kenneht
142 The Crescent
Babylon, NY 17702 / US
02 / D'onofrio, John
83 Highland Road
Staten Island, NY 10308 / US
03 / Ellerbee, James
94 Jolen Drive
Hillsdale, NY 07642 / US
04 / Gould, Jay
21 Pitchpine Place
Medford, NY 11763 / US
05 / Holme, Jennifer
110 East 87th St.
Apt. 3C, New york, NY 10128 / US
06 / Lupario, J.peter
18 Austin Drive
Easton, CT 06612 / US
07 / Marthi, Umesh
7 Colgate Street
Apt# 1, Jersey City, NY 07302 / US
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars E. , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Johansson, Lars E. , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Former [1999/45]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date99201150.216.04.1999
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateUS19980081965P16.04.1998         Original published format: US 81965 P
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0955596
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0955596
Date:04.12.2002
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G06F19/00, G07F19/00
[2002/48]
Former International [1999/45]G06F17/60
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/35]
Former [1999/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Architektur für Kunden-Zugangslösungen[1999/45]
English:Customer access solutions architecture[1999/45]
French:Architecture pour solutions d'accès de clients[1999/45]
Examination procedure05.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
31.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5485370  (MOSS LESLIE C [US], et al) [A] 1,16,17 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 61 * * column 7, line 4 - column 14, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9722941  (BLOCK FINANCIAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,17 * page 2, line 4 - page 8, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [PX]WO9858356  (KEILANI BADIEH Z II [US]) [PX] 1-17 * abstract * * page 7 - page 10 *
 [X]  SAENGER E, "INTERNET-BANKING", NET - ZEITSCHRIFT FUER KOMMUNIKATIONSMANAGEMENT, HUTHIG VERLAG, HEILDERBERG, DE, (1997), vol. 51, no. 7, ISSN 0947-4765, pages 32 - 35, XP000724959 [X] 1-17 * page 1, column 3 - page 2, column 1 * * page 3, column 2 - column 3 *
 [X]  ROBERT HARNISCHMACHER, "Flugversuche: Start frei für die zweite Version des Homebanking-Standards", C'T, no. 9, (1997), URL: http://www.publicare.de/www/e/berichte/42efa2.htm, (20020826), XP002211167 [X] 1-17 * page 3 - page 7 *
 [X]  "Kopf-an-Kopf-Rennen von Internet-Banking-Lösungen in der Schweiz", PUBLICARE MARKETING COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), URL: http://www.publicare.de/www/e/berichte/42efa5.htm, (20020826), XP002211168 [X] 1-17 * page 3 - page 4 *
 [A]  SCHMIDT B, "ELECTRONIC BANKING - STRATEGIEN DER ZUKUNFT GRUENDE FUER DEN AUSBAU ELEKTRONISCHER FINANZDIENSTLEISTUNGEN", GI. GELDINSTITUTE, HOLZMANN, BAD WOERISHOFEN, DE, (1994), vol. 25, no. 7/8, ISSN 0932-4585, pages 46 - 56, XP001007414 [A] 10,12-14 * page 4, column 1 - page 6, column 1 *
 [A]  STRUTHERS-WATSON K ET AL, "NEED MONEY? YOUR WISH IS MY COMMAND", COMMUNICATIONS INTERNATIONAL, NORTHWOOD PUBLICATIONS LTD, GB, (1997), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 0305-2109, pages 8 - 10,12,14, XP000913758 [A] 1,17 * page 1 - page 3 *