Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023877

EP1023877 - Improved intracoronally supported pontic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2002
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2002  [2002/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastflex Corp.
1117 North Graham Avenue Indianapolis
Indiana 46219 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Eastflex Corp.
1117 North Graham Avenue
Indianapolis, Indiana 46219 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lans, Maris J.
14660 Fallscliff Lane
Centreville, Virginia 20120 / US
02 / Purvis, Daniel E.
1117 North Graham Avenue
Indianapolis, Indiana 46219 / US
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Barendregt, Frank
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]Barendregt, Frank, Drs.
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99201342.528.04.1999
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateUS1999023686926.01.1999         Original published format: US 236869
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1023877
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1023877
Date:09.05.2001
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/003
[2000/31]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/05]
Former [2000/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zwischen Pfeilerzähnen einsetzbares Brückenglied[2000/31]
English:Improved intracoronally supported pontic[2000/31]
French:Elément de bridge perfectionné destiné à être placé entre deux couronnes servant de support[2000/31]
Examination procedure10.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/39]
15.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]CA2199532  (DEOM DESIGN INC [CA]) [X] 1,3 * page 4, lines 8-11 * * page 4, lines 20-23 * * page 5, lines 23-26 * * figures 1,2,5-8 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]JPH0686785  ;
 [A]FR899433  (HEINRICH ROOS) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 39-43 * * page 2, lines 2-12,45-49 *;
 [A]DE3609214  (KOERBER KERSTIN, et al) [A] 7 * column 2, lines 58-64 * * column 3, lines 10-45 * * figures 7,8,14 *;
 [PX]US5888068  (LANS MARIS J [US], et al) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940629), vol. 018, no. 344, Database accession no. (C - 1218), [Y] 2 * abstract *