Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0956996

EP0956996 - A trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NC Engineering (Hamiltonsbawn) Limited
2 Killyrudden Road Hamiltonsbawn Richhill
County Armagh, Northern Ireland / GB
[2005/52]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
NC Agricultural Engineering Company Limited
2 Killyrudden Road, Hamiltonsbawn, Richhill
County Armagh, Northern Ireland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Carson, Wilfred
Ashvale Farm, Ballygroobany, Richhill
County Armagh, Northern Ireland / GB
02 / Foster, Brian
14 Springfields, Portadown
County Armagh, Northern Ireland / GB
03 / Nicholl, Norman
33 Mullurg Road, Markethill
County Armagh, Northern Ireland / GB
[1999/46]
Representative(s)O'Connell, Maura , et al
FRKelly
4 Mount Charles
Belfast, Northern Ireland
BT7 1NZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]O'Connell, Maura , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 4 Mount Charles Belfast
BT7 1NZ / GB
Former [2005/31]O'Connell, Maura , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 4 Mount Charles
Belfast, BT7 1NZ, Northern Ireland / GB
Former [1999/46]O'Connell, Maura, Dr. , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 9, University Street
Belfast, BT7 1NA Northern Ireland / GB
Application number, filing date99201420.907.05.1999
[1999/46]
Priority number, dateGB1998000996811.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9809968
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0956996
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0956996
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0956996
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/26, B60P1/273
[2000/39]
Former International [1999/46]B60P1/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/46]
Extension statesAL27.03.2001
LT27.03.2001
LV27.03.2001
MK27.03.2001
RO27.03.2001
SI27.03.2001
TitleGerman:Anhänger[1999/46]
English:A trailer[1999/46]
French:Remorque[1999/46]
Examination procedure27.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2005Fee for grant paid
06.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.08.2005
CY10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
IT10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
LU07.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
IT10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
LU07.05.2006
Former [2008/17]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
IT10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/25]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/14]CH10.08.2005
FI10.08.2005
LI10.08.2005
NL10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
ES21.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI10.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3625566  (SUURONEN TEUVO) [X] 1-4,7,9,14 * column W * [A] 8,10,15;
 [X]JPS6164545  ;
 [X]US3890006  (STOCKWELL ORVILLE E) [X] 1,2 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]JPH01269632  ;
 [A]US3437376  (KEATHLY DONALD C) [A] 11 * column 1, line 12 - line 26 * * column 4, line 39 - line 60; figure - *;
 [A]GB985870  (SVEN ALFRED SANDBERG);
 [A]US3072439  (ADKINS OREL D)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860812), vol. 010, no. 231, Database accession no. (M - 506), [X] 1-4,7-9,14,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900122), vol. 014, no. 033, Database accession no. (M - 923), [A] 10 * abstract *