Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959295

EP0959295 - Luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Holten, Petrus A.J.
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6, 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99201511.514.05.1999
[1999/47]
Priority number, dateEP1998020166219.05.1998         Original published format: EP 98201662
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0959295
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0959295
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0959295
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:F21V11/02, F21V13/10
[2000/34]
Former International [1999/47]F21V11/02
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/19]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leuchte[1999/47]
English:Luminaire[1999/47]
French:Luminaire[1999/47]
Examination procedure23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
10.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2006Fee for grant paid
21.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4109492  (PAROL LEUCHTENKOMPONENTEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 16 - line 19 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0138747  (SEMPERLUX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - line 16 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3002137  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 8 * * figure 1 *