Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971124

EP0971124 - Filter for fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Kotkowicz, George A.
2137 Coronado Drive
Grand Rapids, Michigan 49506 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Denton, Michael John
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99201736.801.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998009376408.06.1998         Original published format: US 93764
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971124
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971124
Date:26.09.2001
[2001/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971124
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M61/16, F02M61/12, F02M51/06
[2001/39]
Former International [2000/02]F02M61/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/24]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filter für Brennstoffeinspritzdüse[2000/02]
English:Filter for fuel injector[2000/02]
French:Filtre pour injecteur de combustible[2000/02]
Examination procedure26.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2003Fee for grant paid
01.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR04.06.2003
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5423489  (WOOD ROSS W) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 10; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5678767  (RAHBAR MEHRAN K) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4471914  (HAFNER UDO ET AL) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 4 - line 27; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4585176  (KUBACH HANS ET AL) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 22 - line 51; figure 1 *