Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963871

EP0963871 - Pedal assembly with hysteresis, in particular for electronic throttle control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/50]Electronic throttle control with hysteresis
[2004/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELEFLEX INCORPORATED
630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Teleflex Incorporated
630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Czajkowski, Julian
The Moffats, The Holloway, Priors Marstan
Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 8RG / GB
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [1999/50]Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date99201805.107.06.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateUS19980088639P09.06.1998         Original published format: US 88639 P
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963871
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0963871
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963871
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60K26/02, G05G1/14
[2001/20]
Former International [1999/50]B60K26/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/13]
Former [2002/07](deleted) 
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hysteresebehaftete Pedalanordnung, insbesondere für elektronische Drosselklappensteuerung[2004/20]
English:Pedal assembly with hysteresis, in particular for electronic throttle control[2004/20]
French:Arrangement de pédale à hystérésis, notamment pour commande électronique du papillon de gaz[2004/20]
Former [1999/50]Hysteresebehaftete, elektronische Drosselklappensteuerung
Former [1999/50]Electronic throttle control with hysteresis
Former [1999/50]Commande électronique à hystérésis du papillon des gaz
Examination procedure28.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
16.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2004Fee for grant paid
24.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
09.01.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
09.01.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
09.01.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
09.01.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.10.2004
IT27.10.2004
DE28.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
GB07.06.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/35]FR27.10.2004
DE28.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
GB07.06.2005
Former [2006/32]FR27.10.2004
DE28.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2006/13]DE28.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/27]ES07.02.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US5697260  (RIXON CHRISTOPHER J [CA], et al) [A] 1,3,11-13,18-20 * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 43; figure - *;
 [DA]US5408899  (STEWART JOSEPH L [US]) [DA] 1,4,11-13,18 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US5819593  (RIXON CHRISTOPHER J [CA], et al) [PA] 1,2,6,7,11-14,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5396870  (BEALE ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1,3,4,9-13,16,18,19 * column W *
by applicantUS5408899