Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968885

EP0968885 - Cooling an engine control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Clamp, Andrew
2 Oakwood Drive
Co Durham DL1 3TB / GB
02 / Purcell, John J.
18D Lock Road
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1QW / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date99201875.414.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001408230.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9814082
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968885
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968885
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968885
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/30]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abkühlung eines Motorsteuerunggerätes[2000/01]
English:Cooling an engine control unit[2000/01]
French:Refroidissement d'une unité de commande moteur[2000/01]
Examination procedure22.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
29.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2006Fee for grant paid
07.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH09126044  ;
 [Y]US4763611  (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4,8-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE2823666  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0841842  (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8;
 [Y]US5685361  (DEMMLER HOLGER [DE], et al) [Y] 5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0309986  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0697807  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3-9 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09126044 A 19970513 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,8-11