Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968791

EP0968791 - Camshaft and method of manufacturing a camshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]Method of manufacturing a camshaft
[2003/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Antcliff, Gary S.
1733 N. Washington
Colombus, IN 47201 / US
02 / Smith, Damian P.
Kelhofstr. 36
9322 Egnach / CH
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date99201917.415.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1998001407930.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9814079
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968791
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968791
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968791
Date:05.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B24B19/12
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nockenwelle und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Nockenwelle[2003/15]
English:Camshaft and method of manufacturing a camshaft[2003/15]
French:Arbre à cames et procédé de fabrication d'un arbre à cames[2003/15]
Former [2000/01]Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Nockenwelle
Former [2000/01]Method of manufacturing a camshaft
Former [2000/01]Procédé de fabrication d'un arbre à cames
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2003Fee for grant paid
16.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4829951  (HAEFELE WALTER [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 13 - line 16 * * column 3, line 1 - line 22; figure - *;
 [A]JPH0370806  ;
 [A]US3882832  (OHSAKI KIYOSHI, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 1 - line 15; figure - *;
 [A]US5041253  (HUSTED ROYCE H [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910613), vol. 015, no. 232, Database accession no. (M - 1124), [A] 2-6 * abstract *