EP0967715 - Brushless DC motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/52] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halfmann, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1999/52] | Gössmann, Klemens, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99201926.5 | 16.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | DE1998128046 | 24.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19828046 | [1999/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967715 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967715 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/14 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
H02P6/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/03] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bürstenloser Gleichstrommotor | [1999/52] | English: | Brushless DC motor | [1999/52] | French: | Moteur à courant continu sans balais | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 01.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE19533161 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [DY] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 35 - line 64 * * figures 1-4,7-11; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US5708578 (STODDARD ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * |