Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971314

EP0971314 - A method for preserving image detail when adjusting the contrast of a digital image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gallagher, Andrew Charles
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Gindele, Edward Brooks
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/16]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/02]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99202039.624.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS19980091848P06.07.1998         Original published format: US 91848 P
US1998016364530.09.1998         Original published format: US 163645
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971314
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971314
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971314
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2001/50]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erhaltung von Bilddetails bei Kontrastveränderung[2000/02]
English:A method for preserving image detail when adjusting the contrast of a digital image[2000/02]
French:Procédé conservant les détails d'une image digitale dont le contraste est ajusté[2000/02]
Examination procedure13.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2003Fee for grant paid
12.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5426517  (SCHWARTZ MICHAEL) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - line 59 * [A] 3-8;
 [A]EP0525949  (POLAROID CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 4 *