Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6013425 | 11.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US28299499 | 31.03.1999 | US10946698 | 06.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000039690 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US10946698 | 06.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0971264 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10946698 | 06.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5955248 | 21.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US10946698 | 06.07.1998 |