Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971264

EP0971264 - Concentrated photographic fixer additive and fixing compositions containing triazinylstilbene and method of photographic processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Craver, Mary Ellen
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Buongiorne, Jean Marie
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/02]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date99202042.024.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998010946606.07.1998         Original published format: US 109466
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971264
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03C5/38, G03C5/26
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Konzentrierter photographischer Fixierzusatz und Triazinylstilben-enthaltende Fixierzusammensetzungen und photographische Verarbeitungsverfahren[2000/02]
English:Concentrated photographic fixer additive and fixing compositions containing triazinylstilbene and method of photographic processing[2000/02]
French:Additif de fixage photographique concentré et compositions de fixage qui contiennent le triazinylstilbène et procédé de traitement photographique[2000/02]
Examination procedure02.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
03.03.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0565023  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 11-13 * page 57, line 25 - line 38; claims 1,2,12-20 * * page 21, line 27 - line 31 * * page 26, line 57 - page 27, line 4 *;
 [A]US4232112  (KUSE SATORU) [A] 11 * column 21, line 51; examples 2,3 * * column 23, line 60 *;
 [A]EP0626374  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1,11 * page 9, line 17 - line 18; claims 18,19 *;
 [A]EP0346071  (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [A] 11 * claims 1,3 *;
 [DA]  - "USE OF OPTICAL BRIGHTENERS IN PHOTOGRAPHIC FIXING SOLUTIONS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, no. 373, ISSN 0374-4353, page 340, XP000518650 [DA] 1,11 * the whole document *