blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969131 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969131



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 111
25.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.06.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.02.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.10.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
01.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
03.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.08.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
16.08.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 15
16.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 19
16.08.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
16.08.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 16
28.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
28.06.1999 Description Search / examination 10
28.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
28.06.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
28.06.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6