blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0969131

Designated contracting statesAT 
CH 
DE 
ES 
IT 
LI 
NL 
Examination procedure13.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE ES IT LI NL
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000224
 
Event date:13.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT CH DE ES IT LI NL
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20020101