Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969131

EP0969131 - Device and method for treating textiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.07.2002  [2002/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stork Brabant B.V.
Wim de Körverstraat 43a
5830 AA Boxmeer / NL
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Breeuwer, René
Valkenlaan 22
2633 HP Delft / NL
02 / Frieling, Karel
Bergstraat 36
7411 ET Deventer / NL
03 / Gooijer, Hendrik
Haarlemmerweg 517
1055 PL Amsterdam / NL
04 / Dunnewijk, Jeroen
James Wattstraat 10
7553 TM Hengelo / NL
05 / Gerritsen, Jan Willem
Everardusplein 6
6602 EP Wijchen / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Riemens, Roelof Harm
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Riemens, Roelof Harm
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99202091.728.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateNL1998100952530.06.1998         Original published format: NL 1009525
NL1999101219431.05.1999         Original published format: NL 1012194
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969131
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:D06B13/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Textilien[2000/01]
English:Device and method for treating textiles[2000/01]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour le traitement des textiles[2000/01]
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
01.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/30]
13.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3688527  (BLUSTAIN STANLEY) [X] 1-4,21 * column 1 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 4 * * column 8, line 14 - column 9, line 23 * * column 15, line 6 - line 14 *;
 [A]DE1810290  (KAESLER KLAUS PETER) [A] 1,5,7,8,21 * figure 1; claims 1,3,4,8 *;
 [A]FR1562461  (GENERAL MILLS INC.) [A] 1,4,21 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 21 *;
 [DA]AT402076B  (MERTINAT HANS DIETER [AT]) [DA] 1,4,21 * page 4, line 42 - page 5, line 1 *;
 [A]US2950725  (EMIL JACKE STANLEY, et al) [A] 10 * column 3, line 7 - line 20 *