Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970819

EP0970819 - Ink-jet recording element containing polymeric mordant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Missell, Gregory Edward
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Decker, David Edward
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/02]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date99202094.128.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011402210.07.1998         Original published format: US 114022
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970819
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970819
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970819
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/30]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungselement, das Polymer-Beizmittel enthält[2000/02]
English:Ink-jet recording element containing polymeric mordant[2000/02]
French:Elément pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre contenant un mordant polymérique[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2004Fee for grant paid
18.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS58177390  (MITSUBISHI) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, column R, line 39 * * page 3, column L, line 22 - line 24 * * page 3, column R, line 2 - line 31; claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE3132248  (FUJI) [Y] 1-4 * page 12, line 9 - line 22 * * page 20, line 6 - line 7 * * page 23; example 1 * * page 30, line 30 - page 31, line 6 * * page 32, line 4 - line 7 * * page 32, line 25 - line 26 * * page 33, line 11 - line 16; claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]EP0847868  (KODAK) [Y] 5-10 * page 4, line 16 - line 17 * * page 5, line 50; claims 1-7 *