Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065053

EP1065053 - Processless printing plate with low ratio of anorganic pigment over hardener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2004/06]
Former [2002/08]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Van Damme, Marc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
RDM-IP/Mo 3811, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / Vermeersch, Joan c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
RDM-IP/Mo 3811, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2001/01]
Application number, filing date99202112.129.06.1999
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1065053
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1065053
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41C1/10
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/38]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verarbeitungsfreie Flachdruckplatte mit niedrigem anorganisches Pigment/Härter Verhältnis[2001/01]
English:Processless printing plate with low ratio of anorganic pigment over hardener[2001/01]
French:Plaque d'impression lithographique sans traitement avec un faible rapport pigment inorganique/durcisseur[2001/01]
Examination procedure03.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
19.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9919143  (KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS CO [US]) [X] 1-8,11 * page 6, line 4 - line 7; example 5 * * page 8, line 27 - line 29 * * claim 1 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]EP0763424  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * examples 1,3 *;
 [A]JPS55105560  ;
 [A]WO9834796  (HORSELL GRAPHIC IND LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * example - * * claim - *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 39, Database accession no. 1980-68629C, XP002119255 & JPS55105560 A 19800813 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *