blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972857

EP0972857 - Electrolytic cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gowans, Bruce Spalding, Kodak Limited
Heastone Drive
Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB
02 / Dartnell, Nicholas John, c/o Kodak Limited
Heastone Drive
Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Lee, Brenda
Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Barker, Brenda
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date99202122.029.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateGB1998001516913.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815169
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972857
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972857
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C25C7/00, C25C1/20
[2000/03]
CPC:
C25C1/20 (EP,US); C25C7/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrolytische Zelle[2000/03]
English:Electrolytic cell[2000/03]
French:Cellule d'électrolyse[2000/03]
Examination procedure27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
28.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2003Fee for grant paid
29.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3021583  (MOCK KARL JOSEF) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 8; claims 1-24 ** figures 6-9 *;
 [PX]DE19749445  (WEINMANN PETER [DE]) [PX] 1,4,5,8,10,11,13 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 39 * * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.