Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978906

EP0978906 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Rollero, Marco
Via Isonzo 8/2
Torino / IT
02 / Brantingham, Duane L.
368 E. Main Street
Cortland, 44410 Ohio / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Denton, Michael John
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99202183.206.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998012813603.08.1998         Original published format: US 128136
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978906
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978906
Date:03.09.2003
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/436
[2000/06]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/22]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder[2000/06]
English:Electrical connector[2000/06]
French:Connecteur électrique[2000/06]
Examination procedure01.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/34]
15.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5122080  (HATAGISHI YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-6 * [Y] 8;
 [XA]DE3441559  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 10, line 20 - page 11; figures 5-10 * [A] 8;
 [Y]EP0673084  (CINCH CONNECTEURS SA [FR]) [Y] 8 * figure 2 *