Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972598

EP0972598 - Method and apparatus for drilling holes in the shell of a cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pikoteknik Oy
Ollinmäentie 43
86110 Parhalahti / FI
For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
Pikoteknik Oy
Ollinmäentie 43
86110 Parhalahti / FI
For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
Pikoteknik Oy
Ollinmäentie 43
86110 Parhalahti / FI
For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Pikoteknik Oy
Ollinmäentie 43
86110 Parhalahti / FI
For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen Gesellschaft mbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vesterlund, Ingmar
Kaukontie 28
86100 Pyhäjoki / FI
02 / Kugler, Georg
Schlegelstrasse 18
89522 Heidenheim / DE
03 / Oechsle, Markus
Falkenbergweg 23
73566 Bartholomä / DE
04 / Kahl, Peter
Schumannstrasse 11
89547 Gerstetten / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani , et al
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Airport Plaza
Ayritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani , et al
Oy Heinänen Ab, Annankatu 31-33 C
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99202186.506.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFI1998000159913.07.1998         Original published format: FI 981599
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972598
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972598
Date:21.05.2003
[2003/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972598
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B23B39/16
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/07]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode und Gerät zum Bohren von Löchern in eine Zylinderwand[2003/21]
English:Method and apparatus for drilling holes in the shell of a cylinder[2000/03]
French:Méthode et appareil de forage de trous dans la paroi d' un cylindre[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]Methode und Gerät zum Bohren von Löchern in einem Zylinderwand
Examination procedure09.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
26.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2005Fee for grant paid
29.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4674925  (THORNTON HENRY M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column W *;
 [AD]EP0545879  (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [AD] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1884752  (KRUEGER HENRY R) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0448947
 EP0545879