Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974467

EP0974467 - Printer and method of compensating for malperforming and inoperative ink nozzles in a print head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation)
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wen, Xin, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Ewell, Lam Jacqueline, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Couwenhoven, Douglas W., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Hauschild, Edward A., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/16]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/04]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99202242.609.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998011990921.07.1998         Original published format: US 119909
US1998019334817.11.1998         Original published format: US 193348
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974467
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drucker und Verfahren zur Kompensierung der fehlendenTintenstrahldüsen in einem Druckkopf[2000/04]
English:Printer and method of compensating for malperforming and inoperative ink nozzles in a print head[2000/04]
French:Imprimante et procédure pour compenser des buses à jet d'encre défaillantes dans une tête d'impression[2000/04]
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
21.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
05.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0783973  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 5,6 * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 55; figures 5-7 * [Y] 7,13;
 [PX]WO9908875  (ENCAD INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,8-12 * abstract *;
 [PX]WO9840222  (RASTER GRAPHICS INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,8-12 * page 3, line 20 - page 25, line 14; figure 1A *;
 [PX]EP0863004  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1-4,8-12 * the whole document *;
 [YA]US5124720  (SCHANTZ CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [Y] 1-4,8-12 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 48; figure - * [A] 5,12,13;
 [Y]EP0646460  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8-12 * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 30; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0744295  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 7,13 * column 7, line 14 - column 19, line 45; figures 2,3,11 *;
 [A]EP0665114  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1,8,12 * page 5, line 15 - page 7, line 44; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]EP0517521  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 9, line 13 - line 54; figures 1,2,13 *;
 [A]US5587730  (KARZ ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 25; figure 5 *
by applicantUS4489335
 US5455608
 US4165363
 US5659342