Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970997

EP0970997 - Flame retardant polycarbonate/abs composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Opposition rejectedpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC.
58 Gumi-daero
Gumi-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Cheil Industries Inc.
332-2, Gochun-Dong
Euiwang-shi, Kyoungki-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, Jong Cheol
408-1502, 4-Danji Apt., Pyulyang-dong
Kwachon-shi, Kyongki-do / KR
02 / Kwon, Ick Hwan
D-1105, Eunnha Apt., Yoido-Dong
Youngdungpo-Gu, Seoul / KR
03 / Jang, Bok Nam
6-1101, Sangah Apt., 165, Okeum-Dong
Songpa-Gu, Seoul / KR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/02]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date99202262.409.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011387210.07.1998         Original published format: US 113872
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970997
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970997
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970997
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08K5/523, // (C08L69/00, 55:02, 25:12, 27:18),(C08L69/00, 51:04)
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   NL [2002/12]
Former [2001/27]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  NL 
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flammhemmende Polycarbonat/ABS-Mischung[2000/02]
English:Flame retardant polycarbonate/abs composition[2000/02]
French:Composition ignifugée à base de polycarbonate/abs[2000/02]
Examination procedure09.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
05.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2003Fee for grant paid
21.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.08.2004   
Bayer MaterialScience AG
Patents and Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2004   
Bayer MaterialScience AG
Patents and Licensing
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
17.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.03.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.04.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/42]
19.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.05.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PY]GB2330583  (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [PY] 1-4,7-16 * example 10; claims 1-9 *;
 [PY]US5864004  (KIM SUNG RYONG [KR], et al) [PY] 1-4,7-16 * examples 1-3; claim 1 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, line 42 - line 65 *;
 [DY]EP0767204  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DY] 1-6,10-12,14-16 * examples 4-6; claims 1,3 * * page 6, line 34 - line 53 *;
 [Y]EP0767215  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-6,10-12,14-16 * examples 20,21; claims 1-7; table 5 * * page 15, line 52 - line 57 *;
 [A]WO9101350  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-3,10-12,14,16 * example 1; claims 1-7 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 2 *;
 [A]JPH06299060
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 02, Database accession no. 1995-012024, XP002145266 & JPH06299060 A 19941025 (UBE CYCON LTD) [A] 13 * abstract *