Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974925

EP0974925 - Angled targeting data reader and reading system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2002
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Leidig, Carl F., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Nelson, David J., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Bryant, Robert C., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Lewandowsky, Klaus , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99202279.812.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012190724.07.1998         Original published format: US 121907
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974925
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/12, G06K19/06
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Datenlesevorrichtung mit Zielen unter einem Winkel und Lesesystem[2000/04]
English:Angled targeting data reader and reading system[2000/04]
French:Lecteur de données ayant un angle de visée et système de lecture[2000/04]
Examination procedure01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/39]
26.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid