Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972956

EP0972956 - Self-restraining metal ring nuts, and processes for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Urama S.r.l.
Via Garibaldi, 9
20048 Carate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Perego, Giuseppe
Via Cascinette 12
23893 Cassago Brianza (Lecco) / IT
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Martegani, Franco , et al
Franco Martegani S.r.l.
Via Carlo Alberto, 41
20052 Monza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Martegani, Franco , et al
Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41
20052 Monza (Milano) / IT
Application number, filing date99202309.314.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0164417.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI981644
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972956
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16B39/38, F16B39/34, B21K1/70
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Selbsthemmende Mutter und Verfahren für seine Herstellung[2000/03]
English:Self-restraining metal ring nuts, and processes for the production thereof[2000/03]
French:Ecrou auto-freiné et son procédé de fabrication[2000/03]
Examination procedure16.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/50]
03.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0488848  (SHUR LOK INTERNATIONAL SA) [X] 1,3,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-9,12,13;
 [XA]US4248285  (FLAIG CHRISTIAN) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 31; figures 5-8 * [A] 3-13;
 [XA]DE4313809  (FLAIG & HOMMEL GMBH CO KG) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 17-43; figures 3,4 * [A] 3-13;
 [A]US2222460  (CROWLEY J.C.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2952289  (KREIDEL H. ET AL.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *