Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974764

EP0974764 - Coupling an accessory to an engine crankshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road Darlington
County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
CNH U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Cummins Engine Company, Ltd.
Yarm Road
Darlington, County Durham DL1 4PW / GB
For all designated states
Iveco (UK) Ltd.
Iveco Ford House, Station Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 1SR / GB
For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Chimonides, Nikos J.
Rainbow Cottage Dodford Daventry
Northants NN7 4SX / GB
02 / Smith, Damian P.
Kelhofstr. 36
9322 Egnach / CH
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Vandenbroucke, Alberic
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date99202345.716.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateGB1998001575021.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815750
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974764
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974764
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974764
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16D1/06, F16D1/08, F02B67/04
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/49]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kupplung eines Antriebgerätes an einer Motorkurbelwelle[2000/04]
English:Coupling an accessory to an engine crankshaft[2000/04]
French:Accouplement d'un accessoire à un vilebrequin de moteur[2000/04]
Examination procedure21.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2006Fee for grant paid
03.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4376335  (FURUKAWA HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 11; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5;
 [Y]DE2018367  (DEUTSCHE STAR) [Y] 3-5 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE7804191U  (BAUKNECHT) [A] 2,3,5 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE1973729U  (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 2 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2556427  (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [A] 3,5 * page 5, line 35 - page 7, line 4; figures 7,8 *