blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0975009


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.04.2008 Change - representative published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
16.07.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.09.2004  [2004/36]
23.03.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.10.2003 First examination report
08.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2003 Change - representative published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
14.08.2002 Renewal fee
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
20.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
03.11.2000 Loss of particular rights
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
25.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  11.10.2000 [2000/41]
24.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
20.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  07.06.2000 [2000/23]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]