blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0975009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000040728Global Dossier 08.02.2000A
Priority number Date
JP20608298 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0975009Global Dossier 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP20608298 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20000011844 25.02.2000A
Priority number Date
JP20608298 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW419773B 21.01.2001B
Priority number Date
JP20608298 22.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6305898 23.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP20608298 22.07.1998