blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0975009

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure20.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:07.06.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000412
 
Event date:11.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20031009
 
Event date:01.09.2004 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040420