Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975009

EP0975009 - Wafer transfer mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASM JAPAN K.K.
23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama Tama-shi
Tokyo 206-0025 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ASM JAPAN K.K.
23-1, 6-chome, Nagayama
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamagishi, Takayuki
c/o ASM Japan K.K., 23-1 Nagayama, 6-chome
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP
02 / Suwada, Masaei
c/o ASM Japan K.K., 23-1 Nagayama, 6-chome
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP
03 / Furukawara, Kazunori
c/o ASM Japan K.K., 23-1 Nagayama, 6-chome
Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/04]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99202406.721.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020608222.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20608298
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975009
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, B21D43/10
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Waferübertragungsmechanismus[2000/04]
English:Wafer transfer mechanism[2000/04]
French:Mécanisme de transfer pour plaquettes[2000/04]
Examination procedure12.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/36]
20.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5374147  (HIROKI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * column 1, line 5 - line 66 * * column 2, line 33 - line 37 * * column 8, line 1 - column 12, line 29 * * figures 10-17; claim - * [A] 5,11;
 [A]US5162047  (WADA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-8,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 25 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 53 *;
 [A]EP0448316  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 12 * * column 3, line 2 - column 5, line 21 * * column 7, line 10 - line 43 *