Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980024

EP0980024 - Homogeneous single-part photographic color developing concentrate and method of making [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Darmon, Charles Max, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Buongiorne, Jean Marie, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Haight, Michael John, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Schwartz, Paul Andrew, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2000/07]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date99202525.430.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013220011.08.1998         Original published format: US 132200
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980024
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980024
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980024
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/407
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2002/14]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Photographisches einteiliges homogenes Farbentwicklerkonzentrat und Herstellungsmethode[2000/07]
English:Homogeneous single-part photographic color developing concentrate and method of making[2000/07]
French:Concentré homogène en une seule partie pour révélateur photographique en couleur et méthode de préparation[2000/07]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
03.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
19.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2002Fee for grant paid
08.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02002323.0  / EP1223465
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0603586  (ILFORD LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * see claims 1 and 5; page 2, lines 40-41 and 48-51; page 2, line 52 to page 3, line 3; Example 1 *;
 [A]EP0762199  (KODAK PATHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * see claim 7 *;
 [PA]JPH10333302
 [PA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1999-110257, XP002130333 & JPH10333302 A 19981218 (CHUGAI SHASIN YAKUHIN KK) [PA] 1-15 * abstract *