Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978823

EP0978823 - Speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
7839 Churchill Way
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kao, Yu-Hung
1515 Rio Grande, No. 1609
Plano, Texas 75075 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [2000/06]Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited, P.O. Box 5069
Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB
Application number, filing date99202570.005.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS19980095394P05.08.1998         Original published format: US 95394 P
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978823
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978823
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978823
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/08
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/35]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spracherkennung[2000/06]
English:Speech recognition[2000/06]
French:Reconnaissance de la parole[2000/06]
Examination procedure03.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/32]
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2006Fee for grant paid
01.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Request for further processing for:30.01.2006Request for further processing filed
30.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.02.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US5241619  (SCHWARTZ RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 28 - line 45; claim 1 *;
 [A]  DESHMUKH N ET AL, "Efficient search strategies in hierarchical pattern recognition systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL SOUTHEASTERN SYMPOSIUM ON SYSTEM THEORY, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (1995), ISSN 0094-2898, pages 88 - 91, XP002126397 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [04.1]; figure 1 *