Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983725

EP0983725 - Tomato products enriched in beta-cyclocitral [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2001/30]For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2000/10]For:ES  FR  IT  NL 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Deutz, Inge Elisabeth, Unilever Research Vlaard.
Olivier van Noorthlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
02 / Dunphy, Patrick Joseph
Unilever Research Colworth, Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
03 / Van der Hijden, Hendrikus Theodorus
Unilever Research Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Wurfbain, Gilles L. , et al
Unilever N.V.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Wurfbain, Gilles L. , et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date99202701.120.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateEP1998030704002.09.1998         Original published format: EP 98307040
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983725
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983725
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/212, A23L1/24, A23L1/23
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/22]
Former [2000/49]ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
Former [2000/47]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit beta-cyclocitral angereicherte Tomatenprodukte[2000/10]
English:Tomato products enriched in beta-cyclocitral[2000/10]
French:Produits à base de tomates enrichis en beta-cyclocitral[2000/10]
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
09.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
23.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2002Fee for grant paid
29.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3826851  (GUADAGNI D, et al) [AD] 3 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5705372  (BELIN JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 67 * * claims 1,3,5 *;
 [A]EP0777975  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-11 * example 8 * * page 5, line 38 - line 40 *;
 [A]US4978549  (TAKADA NORIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 57 * * column 4, line 45 - line 53 * * column 5, line 32 - line 65 * * example - *;
 [A]FR2731321  (LUCHER ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 2 *;
 [A]DE3603359  (GIBERTI MODESTO) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [AD]  A.J. TAYLOR, D.S. MOTTRAM, "Flavour Science - Recent Developments: The Co-Oxidation of Carotenoids by Lipoxygenase in Tomatoes", SPECIAL PUBLICATION - ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY., ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, LONDON., GB, (1996), vol. 197, ISSN 0260-6291, pages 32 - 37, XP000856023 [AD] 1-11 * table 2 *