Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986948

EP0986948 - Flower pot for group planting to be placed on a pole [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ito, Shoko
5-11, Kasuga 4-chome Ibaraki-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Ito, Shoko
5-11, Kasuga 4-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Wakerley, Helen Rachael
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Wakerley, Helen Rachael
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99202747.425.08.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateJP1998028353318.09.1998         Original published format: JP 28353398
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0986948
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0986948
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986948
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01G9/02
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/50]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Blumentopf für eine Anzahl von Pflanzen zum Auflegen auf einer Stütze[2000/12]
English:Flower pot for group planting to be placed on a pole[2000/12]
French:Pot à fleurs pour planter un groupe de plantes, pour être mis sur un poteau[2000/12]
Examination procedure09.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
22.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2001Fee for grant paid
27.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE11.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
[2004/05]
Former [2003/31]DE11.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5606824  (RUIBAL MICHAEL A [US]) [Y] 1,3-9,13 * the whole document * [A] 2,11;
 [Y]US5311700  (THOMAS JOHNNY D [US]) [Y] 1,3-9,13 * column 1, line 9 - line 10; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5438797  (LENDEL GEORGE [US]) [A] 10 * column 4, line 63 - line 65; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE29612044U  (DISCHINGER JAKOB [DE]) [A] 12,13 * page 5, paragraph L; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5450691  (CHRISTIE MOLLY C [CA], et al) [A] 2,11 * column 5, line 32 - line 37; figure 6 *