Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991145

EP0991145 - Two-part electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Hackel, Oliver
Am Hundsbusch 40
42111 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Drescher, Thomas
Waager Delle 1
42499 Hueckeswagen / DE
03 / Schekalla, Peter
Engelshohe 24
Wuppertal 42329 / DE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/14]01 / Hackel, Oliver
Uellendahl 119
Wuppertal 42109 / DE
02 / Drescher, Thomas
Waager Delle 1
42499 Hueckeswagen / DE
03 / Schekalla, Peter
Engelshohe 24
Wuppertal 42329 / DE
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Denton, Michael John
Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99202882.906.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814469329.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844693
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991145
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991145
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991145
Date:25.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/629
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/29]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweiteiliger Steckverbinder[2000/14]
English:Two-part electrical connector[2000/14]
French:Connecteur électrique en deux parties[2000/14]
Examination procedure25.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
12.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2005Fee for grant paid
22.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES05.09.2005
GB06.09.2005
[2007/21]
Former [2006/14]ES05.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2300767  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 13 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 20 *;
 [A]EP0669680  (CINCH CONNECTEURS SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 38 *;
 [A]EP0273999  (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 28 *;
 [A]EP0722204  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 29 *;
 [A]DE19651436  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 58 *;
 [AD]EP0722203  (MOLEX INC [US]) [AD] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 5, line 15 - line 52 * * column 7, line 56 - column 10, line 11 *