Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962130

EP0962130 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 16.11.2005  [2005/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 110
3147 PA Maassluis / NL
[2004/13]
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Der Lely, Cornelis
7 Brüschenrain
6300 Zug / CH
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M.
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M.
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date99202957.922.06.1994
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateNL1993000109824.06.1993         Original published format: NL 9301098
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962130
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962130
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962130
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/04, A01J5/017, A01J7/04
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1999/49]
TitleGerman:Konstruktion zum automatischen Melken von Tieren[1999/49]
English:A construction for automatically milking animals[1999/49]
French:Installation de traite automatique d'animaux[1999/49]
Examination procedure15.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2004Fee for grant paid
07.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94201790.6  / EP0630558
Divisional application(s)EP03078501.8  / EP1393620
EP05077901.6  / EP1645181
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE17.06.2004
GB22.06.2004
[2005/46]
Former [2004/40]SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0209206  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 4 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 14 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4941433  (HANAUER GEORGE E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 44 * * column 9, line 3 - line 11 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4010714  (NOTSUKI IWAO ET AL) [A] 1 * column 6, line 40 - line 48 * * column 7, line 28 - line 36 * * figure -; claim - *