Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990878

EP0990878 - Method and apparatus for determining the stability of a layer of foam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haffmans B.V.
Marius Dammeweg 30, Postbus 3150
NL-5902 RD Venlo / NL
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Van Akkeren, Franciscus Johannes Jacobus
Teune Smeedstraat 13
6039 ES Stramproy / NL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2001/34]Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/14]Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th., Ir. , et al
Octrooibureau Zuid, Bureau voor Merken en Modellen B.V., Postbus 4582
5601 EN Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99202998.315.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateNL1998101021329.09.1998         Original published format: NL 1010213
[2000/14]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990878
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990878
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/00, G01N33/14, G01F23/24
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ermitteln der Stabilität einer Schaumschicht[2000/14]
English:Method and apparatus for determining the stability of a layer of foam[2000/14]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour déterminer la stabilité d'une couche de mousse[2000/14]
Examination procedure20.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
19.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2003Fee for grant paid
25.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
FR07.05.2003
IT07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
GB15.09.2003
IE15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
FR07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
GB15.09.2003
IE15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
Former [2005/02]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
GB15.09.2003
IE15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
Former [2004/45]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
GB15.09.2003
IE15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
Former [2004/40]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
IE15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
Former [2004/39]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
LU15.09.2003
Former [2004/36]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
CY15.09.2003
Former [2004/05]CH07.05.2003
FI07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/03]CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
ES18.08.2003
Former [2004/02]CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
NL07.05.2003
GR07.08.2003
PT07.08.2003
SE07.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE07.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]NL7605981  (KRONENBOURG BRASSERIES) [A] 1,5,7,8 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2161601  (BASS PLC) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0240432  (TEPRAL SA [FR]) [A] 1,5,7 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 30; figures 3,4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4677304  (CAMP MARK A [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 9; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4059016  (KITZINGER FRANK, et al) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *