blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973099

EP0973099 - Parallel data processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Definitive list of designationspublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lockheed Martin Corporation
6801 Rockledge Drive
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Meeker, Woodrow L.
3122 Ninth Street
Orlando, Florida 32820 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Pratt, Richard Wilson
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99203021.313.09.1994
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973099
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973099
Date:16.04.2003
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:G06F15/80
[2000/03]
CPC:
G06F15/8023 (EP); G06F9/3885 (EP); G06F9/3887 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Paralleler Datenprozessor[2000/03]
English:Parallel data processor[2000/03]
French:Processeur parallèle de données[2003/16]
Former [2000/03]Processeur parallele de données
Examination procedure16.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
23.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94929193.4  / EP0728337
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200209   M06   Not yet paid
30.09.200310   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9004235  (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP) [X] 1,3,5-9,12-16 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,10,11;
 [XA]US4739474  (HOLSZTYNSKI WLODZIMIERZ) [X] 1,3,5-9,12-16 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,10,11;
 [A]EP0539595  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4314349  (BATCHER KENNETH E) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - WONG W F ET AL, "A preliminary evaluation of a massively parallel processor: GAPP", MICROPROCESSING & MICROPROGRAMMING, JULY 1990, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0165-6074, vol. 29, no. 1, pages 53 - 62, XP000136716 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(90)90011-W
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.