Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991047 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991047



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 104
11.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
29.03.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.04.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.12.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.12.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.12.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
25.07.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 8
20.01.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
22.08.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.07.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
03.07.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.07.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
20.09.1999 Description Search / examination 9
20.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 7
20.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 25
20.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6