blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991047


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
25.03.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
02.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  19.05.2004  [2004/21]
10.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.11.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.09.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.07.2003 Change - representative published on  10.09.2003  [2003/37]
18.09.2002 Renewal fee
02.03.2002 Change - representative published on  17.04.2002  [2002/16]
12.09.2001 Renewal fee
19.07.2001 Change - extension states
17.03.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
02.02.2001 Request for examination filed published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
30.06.2000 Publication of search report published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
30.06.2000 Change - classification published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]