blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991047
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000108491Global Dossier 18.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0991047Global Dossier 19.05.2004B1
EP0991047 16.08.2000A3
EP0991047 05.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9904386 03.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1108929C 21.05.2003C
CN1249993 12.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69917402T 16.06.2005T2
DE69917402D 24.06.2004D1
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6136752 24.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US16506698 02.10.1998