Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991047

EP0991047 - Receiver having authenticating marks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Paz-Pujalt, Gustavo R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Patton, David L., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Fredlund, John R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/16]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/14]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99203073.420.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1998016506602.10.1998         Original published format: US 165066
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991047
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991047
Date:16.08.2000
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991047
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09F3/00, G09F3/02, B41M3/14
[2000/33]
Former International [2000/14]G09F3/00, G09F3/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/18]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Empfangsprodukt mit Echtheitsmarken[2000/14]
English:Receiver having authenticating marks[2000/14]
French:Produit récépteur avec marques d'authenticité[2000/14]
Examination procedure20.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
02.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2004Fee for grant paid
28.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0800929  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 11, line 7 - line 42; figures 18,19,27 *;
 [A]EP0743192  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,10 * page 4, line 32 - line 40 * * page 7, line 8 - line 13 * * page 11, line 32 - line 38 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5267754  (KAULE WITTICH [DE]) [A] 1,6-10 * column 4, line 28 - line 54 * * figures 2,7,8 *
by applicantUSRE33260E
 US5752152
 US5772250
 US5768674