Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992200

EP0992200 - Automatic footwear parts processing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Officine Meccaniche CERIM S.p.A.
Via S. Martino della Battaglia, 11/B
20100 Milano / IT
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Marazzi, Paolo
Via Roma, 1
26017 Torlino (Cremona) / IT
02 / Mercalli, Luciano
Via Bramante, 8
27029 Vigevano (Pavia) / IT
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Faraggiana, Vittorio
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l.
Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing.
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99203106.222.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0208329.09.1998         Original published format: IT MI982083
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992200
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A43D111/00, A43D25/18, A43D119/00, A43D37/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesAL10.10.2000
LT10.10.2000
LV10.10.2000
MK10.10.2000
RO10.10.2000
SI10.10.2000
TitleGerman:Automatische Bearbeitungsmaschine für Schuhteile[2000/15]
English:Automatic footwear parts processing machine[2000/15]
French:Machine automatique de traitement des parties de chaussures[2000/15]
Examination procedure10.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
10.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0591596  (COMELZ SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 33 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE4215663  (WINTER GERHARD DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 23 - line 59 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0596570  (MEC B D F S R L OFF [IT]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0128756  (BRITISH UNITED SHOE MACHINERY [GB], et al) [A] 9-12 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 31 * * figure 1 *