Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994369

EP0994369 - Optical shield with graduated conical baffles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOEING NORTH AMERICAN, Inc.
IP Dept., D/676 M/S 110-WSB43, P.O. Box 2515 Seal Beach
California 90740-1515 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Boeing North American, Inc.
IP Dept., D/676 M/S 110-WSB43, P.O. Box 2515
Seal Beach, California 90740-1515 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lundgren, Mark A.
4672 Feather River Road
Corona, California 91720 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/16]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99203107.022.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017360416.10.1998         Original published format: US 173604
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994369
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994369
Date:24.10.2001
[2001/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/00, G02B27/00
[2001/43]
Former International [2000/16]G02B5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/29]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Abschirmung mit abgestuften konischen Ablenkplatten[2000/16]
English:Optical shield with graduated conical baffles[2000/16]
French:Ecran de protection optique utilisant des lames de déflection graduées et coniques[2000/16]
Examination procedure09.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
25.04.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.08.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
23.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
11.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4106856  (BABISH RICHARD CONSTANTINE) [X] 1,2,7,9-11 * column 1, line 60 - line 68 * * column 2, line 43 - line 50 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4542963  (LINLOR WILLIAM I [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5225931  (STAVROUDIS ORESTES N [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5189554  (VANASSE GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 12 - line 65 *
 [X]  BOCK J J ET AL, "COOLED BAFFLE SYSTEM FOR SPACEBORNE INFRARED TELESCOPES", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (19950501), vol. 34, no. 13, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2268 - 2277, XP000504839 [X] 1,2,7,9-11 * figure 1 * * figure caption *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.34.002268