blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992515 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992515



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 101
18.08.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.09.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.05.2004 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
14.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.01.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.01.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.09.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
02.05.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 4
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
24.09.1999 Description Search / examination 18
24.09.1999 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
24.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5