blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992515


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
20.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
19.08.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.10.2005  [2005/40]
22.07.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2005  [2005/36]
20.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
13.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
27.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  13.10.2004  [2004/42]
06.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
04.10.2002 Change - representative published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
10.10.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]