Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992515

EP0992515 - Catalyst for the polymerisation of olefins, process for its production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE - BELGIUM (Société Anonyme)
rue du Prince Albert, 44
1050 Bruxelles / BE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Detrez, Charles
rue Potaerde, 19
1080 Bruxelles / BE
02 / Koch, Benoit
rue de Lens-Saint-Servais, 8
4280 Hannut / BE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Smith, Julian Philip Howard , et al
BP International Limited
Patents & Agreements
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex
TW16 7LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Smith, Julian Philip Howard , et al
BP International Limited, Group Patents & Agreements, Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Former [2000/15]Destryker, Elise Martine
Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date99203152.624.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateBE1998000071905.10.1998         Original published format: BE 9800719
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992515
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992515
Date:13.10.2004
Language:FR
[2004/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/02, C08F10/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Katalysator für die Olefinpolymerisation, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung[2000/15]
English:Catalyst for the polymerisation of olefins, process for its production and use[2000/15]
French:Catalyseur destiné à la polymérisation des oléfines, procédé pour sa fabrication et utilisation[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
27.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2004Fee for grant paid
14.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.10.2004
IE13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
SE13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
PT13.03.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT13.10.2004
IE13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
SE13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/46]AT13.10.2004
IE13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/36]AT13.10.2004
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/27]GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/26]GR13.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0529377  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * examples 1-4 * * page 3, line 42 - line 47 *;
 [A]WO9426791  (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 6 - line 11 * * example 1 *;
 BE1007148  [ ] (SOLVAY [BE])