Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993882

EP0993882 - Method for the adaptive folding of plates and device applying such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haco, naamloze vennootschap
Oekensestraat 120
8800 Roeselare-Rumbeke / BE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Coopman, Jose
Maarschalk Plumerlaan 89 bus 2A
8900 Ieper / BE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date99203154.227.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateBE1998000073313.10.1998         Original published format: BE 9800733
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993882
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B21D5/02, G01B5/24
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum adaptiven Biegen von Platten und eine dieses Verfahren ausführende Vorrichtung[2000/16]
English:Method for the adaptive folding of plates and device applying such a method[2000/16]
French:Méthode de pliage adaptatif des tôles et dispositif pour l' application d' une telle méthode[2000/16]
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
12.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5483750  (OOENOKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9641690  (TRUMPF GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 4-6,9-12 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2362722  (PROMECAN SISSON LEHMANN [FR]);
 [A]GB2072551  (HESS J)