Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993163

EP0993163 - Distributed client-based data caching system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.07.2005  [2005/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Backweb Technologies Ltd.
P.O. Box 3581
Ramat Gan 52522 / IL
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Delaney, Hubert
23 Chessor Lane
Wilton CT 06897 / US
02 / Ruppin, Adi
49 Hamarganit
Ramat Gan 52584 / IS
03 / Hass, Lior
16 Faivel
Tel Aviv 62995 / IS
04 / Faigon, Ofer
9 Ben-Dor, Kiryat Moshe
Jerusalem 96103 / IS
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Mertens, Hans Victor
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
J.J. Viottastraat 31
1071 JP Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Mertens, Hans Victor
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99203169.028.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1998016668605.10.1998         Original published format: US 166686
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993163
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F17/30
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [2000/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  LI 
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur verteilten Datencachespeicherung in Kundenendgeräten[2000/15]
English:Distributed client-based data caching system and method[2000/15]
French:Système et méthode de cache distribuée de données dans des terminaux Client[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/29]
18.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/29]
Request for further processing for:05.06.2003Request for further processing filed
05.06.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.06.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200305   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2003
30.09.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0837584  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 3, line 19 * * column 10, line 35 - line 41 * * figure 1 * [A] 8-10 [Y] 3-7;
 [YA]GB2294132  (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [Y] 3-7 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 30 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * [A] 8-10;
 [A]US5249290  (HEIZER ISAAC J [US]) [A] 9 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 2 *;
 [PA]US5864854  (BOYLE DOUGLAS B [US]) [PA] 8 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 57 *