blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0967524 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0967524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 837
30.07.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.07.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
18.07.2008 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
03.01.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.11.2001 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
07.11.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.10.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.09.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
10.09.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
17.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 8
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 44
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 49
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 46
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 45
10.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 45
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 69
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 47
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 76
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 68
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 44
10.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 49
29.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 23
29.09.1999 Description Search / examination 133
29.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 24
29.09.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
29.09.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7